Sokolova, Elena Anatolievna (CPSO#: 97119)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Dec 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 20 Dec 2011

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Russian

Education:MOSCOW MEDICAL STOMATOLOGY INSTITUTE, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 206
3030 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2T7
Phone: (416) 289-0185
Fax: (416) 289-0187
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

2867 Ellesmere Road
Toronto ON  M1E4B9
Canada
Phone: (416) 284-8131
Fax: (416)281-7438
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Thunder Bay Health Science Centre
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Canada
Phone: (807) 684-6000
Fax: (807) 684-5890
County: District of Thunder Bay
Electoral District: 09

3000 Lawrence Avenue East
Building B
Suite 2202
Toronto ON  M1P 2V1
Canada
Phone: (416) 431-9713
Fax: (416) 431-5259
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Elena Sokolova Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 27 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Sokolova ( CPSO# 97119 )

Business Address:
Suite 206
3030 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2T7
Phone Number: (416) 289-0185

Business Address:
2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 4B9
Phone Number: (416) 284-8131

Business Address:
Suite 2202
3000 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V1
Phone Number: (416) 431-9713

Business Address:
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone Number: (807) 684-6000

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Pennsylvania

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 20 Dec 2011 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Dec 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 19 Jun 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 19 Jun 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Jul 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 19 Jun 2014
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 12 Jul 2013

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 12 Jul 2013 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.   Elena   Anatolievna  Sokolova  may  practise  medicine  independently  in
            neurology, only.