Soliman, Gamal Mikhail Labib (CPSO#: 54506)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 May 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Aug 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Cairo, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit D
210 Martindale Road
St Catharines ON  L2R 0B2
Phone: (905) 346-0170
Fax: (905) 346-0338
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. G. Soliman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 31 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Soliman ( CPSO# 54506 )

Business Address:
Unit D
210 Martindale Road
St Catharines ON  L2S 0B2
Phone Number: (905) 346-0170

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Florida
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 1992 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 03 Sep 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GAMAL MIKHAIL LABIB SOLIMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOLIMAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 5 - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Jul 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Jan 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Jul 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 May 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Aug 1992