Soliman, Samy (CPSO#: 86996)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Jan 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Jan 2011

Summary

Former Name: Marzouk Guirguis, Samy Soliman (used until: 22 Dec 2009 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Ain Shams University, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Strathroy Middlesex General
Hospital
395 Carrie Street
Strathroy ON  N7G 3J4
Phone: (519) 245-5295 Ext. 5130
Fax: (519) 245-4354
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Samy Soliman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 12 2015


Corporation Name: Samy Soliman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 11 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Soliman ( CPSO# 86996 )

Business Address:
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital
395 Carrie Street
Suite 337
Strathroy ON  N7G 3J4
Phone Number: (519) 245-5295

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 15 Dec 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SAMY SOLIMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOLIMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 23 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 14 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Dec 2009 to 14 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Dec 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jan 2011