Solish, Nowell Jay (CPSO#: 62353)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Jul 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Womens College Campus
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone: (416) 323-7732
Fax: (416) 323-6306
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

66 Avenue Road
Toronto ON  M5R 3N8
Canada
Phone: (416) 964-8888
Fax: (416) 964-6172
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nowell Solish Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 21 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Solish ( CPSO# 62353 )

Business Address:
1 - 66 Avenue Road
Concourse Level
Toronto ON  M5R 3N8
Phone Number: (416) 964-8888

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NOWELL JAY SOLISH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOLISH is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1990 to 17 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Clinical Fellow - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1991