Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Somogyi, Dan Mitchell (CPSO#: 70829)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Sep 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Sep 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 206
2900 Steeles Avenue East
Thornhill ON  L3T 4X1
Phone: (905) 881-6667
Fax: (905) 731-1290
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Clinical Neurophysiology Unit
Room M1600
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Canada
Phone: (416) 480-4475
Fax: (416) 480-4674
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Somogyi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 17 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Somogyi ( CPSO# 70829 )
Dr. S. Shuldiner ( CPSO# 76266 )

Business Address:
2900 Steeles Avenue East
Suite 206
Thornhill ON  L3T 4X1
Phone Number: (905) 881-6667

Business Address:
University City Mall
45 Four Winds Drive
Toronto ON  M3J 1K7
Phone Number: (416) 665-7708

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 06 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAN MITCHELL SOMOGYI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOMOGYI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 31 Dec 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 31 Dec 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Dec 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Sep 1996