Sondhi, Asha Parkash (CPSO#: 59785)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Oct 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Nalanda Medical College, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Asha Sondhi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 24 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Sondhi ( CPSO# 59785 )

Business Address:
404 Health Centre
Unit 46
1111 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 8X2
Phone Number: (905) 868-8330

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Nov 1990 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ASHA PARKASH SONDHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SONDHI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Oct 1989