Song, John Young (CPSO#: 67135)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
165 Plymouth Road
Suite E
Welland ON  L3B 3E1
Phone: (905) 734-9434
Fax: (905) 734-7584
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. John Song & Dr. Krista Jonas Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 01 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Jonas ( CPSO# 66948 )
Dr. J. Song ( CPSO# 67135 )

Business Address:
65 Third Street
Welland ON  L3B 4W6
Phone Number: (905) 732-6111

Business Address:
Brock University
500 Glenridge Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 3A1
Phone Number: (905) 688-5550

Business Address:
Suite E
165 Plymouth Road
Welland ON  L3B 3E1
Phone Number: (905) 734-9434

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System Port Colborne General Site Port Colborne
Niagara Health System,Welland County General Site Welland

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN YOUNG SONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SONG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 31 Dec 1998
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1998