Soon, Ah-Kooi (CPSO#: 25704)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English, Mandarin, Swatow, Taiwanese

Education:National Taiwan University, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shawn Jay Soon Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 10 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Soon ( CPSO# 25704 )
Dr. S. Soon ( CPSO# 76165 )

Business Address:
2nd Floor
4240 Sheppard Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1S 1T5
Phone Number: (416) 628-4997

Business Address:
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Phone Number: (416) 438-2911

Business Address:
3030 Birchmount Avenue
Scarborough ON  M1W 3W3
Phone Number: (416) 495-2600

Medical Records Location

Address: PO Box 42288 128 Queen St S Mississauga, ON L5M 1K8
Date Received: 23 May 2018


Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact: 4240 Sheppard Avenue East Scarborough, ON M1S 1T5 Fax: 416-850-4143
Date Received: 18 Jan 2012

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 May 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018