Soon, Shawn Jay (CPSO#: 76165)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Jun 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Mandarin

Education:McMaster University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
4240 Sheppard Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1S 1T5
Phone: (416) 628-4997 Ext. 1
Fax: (416) 850-4146
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shawn Jay Soon Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 10 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Soon ( CPSO# 25704 )
Dr. S. Soon ( CPSO# 76165 )

Business Address:
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Phone Number: (416) 438-2911

Business Address:
3030 Birchmount Avenue
Scarborough ON  M1W 3W3
Phone Number: (416) 495-2600

Business Address:
2nd Floor
4240 Sheppard Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1S 1T5
Phone Number: (416) 628-4997

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHAWN JAY SOON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2007