Soon-Shiong, Gregory (CPSO#: 57708)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Aug 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Aug 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Afrikaans, English

Education:University of Witwatersrand, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
9651 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 1V7
Phone: (905) 883-6614
Fax: (905) 883-6904
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. G. Soon-Shiong Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 12 2017


Corporation Name: Dr. G. Soon-Shiong Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 20 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Soon-Shiong ( CPSO# 57708 )

Business Address:
Mackenzie Richmond Hill Hospital
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone Number: (905) 883-1212

Business Address:
2 - 9651 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 1V7
Phone Number: (905) 883-6614

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 08 Nov 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GREGORY SOON-SHIONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOON-SHIONG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 31 Dec 1994
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Sep 1986
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 05 Aug 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Aug 2010