Southcott, William Peter (CPSO#: 29705)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Nov 1977

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Nov 1977

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
176 Essex Street
Sarnia ON  N7T 4R9
Phone: (519) 336-4100
Fax: (519) 336-0570
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: W. Peter Southcott Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 24 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Southcott ( CPSO# 29705 )
Dr. W. Southcott ( CPSO# 111188)

Business Address:
176 Essex Street
Sarnia ON  N7T 4R9
Phone Number: (519) 336-4100

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Arizona
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bluewater Health Sarnia
Bluewater Health,Charlotte Eleanor Englehart Site Petrolia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 19 Nov 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WILLIAM PETER SOUTHCOTT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOUTHCOTT is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Nov 1977