Soutter, Donald Ian (CPSO#: 31457)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1978

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 May 1980

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 611
581 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P6
Phone: (905) 853-4448
Fax: (905) 853-7411
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nancy K. Down Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 01 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Soutter ( CPSO# 31457 )
Dr. N. Down ( CPSO# 32556 )

Business Address:
218 - 1333 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2J 1V1
Phone Number: (416) 491-0345


Corporation Name: D. Ian Soutter Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 05 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Soutter ( CPSO# 31457 )
Dr. N. Down ( CPSO# 32556 )

Business Address:
611 - 581 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P6
Phone Number: (905) 853-4448

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 22 Nov 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DONALD IAN SOUTTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOUTTER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 May 1980