Souza, Carolina Althoff (CPSO#: 85559)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Aug 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 30 Aug 2006

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Portuguese

Education:Universidade Federal Do Parana, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
31 Linden Terrace
Ottawa ON  K1S 1Z1
Phone: (613) 233-6027
Fax: (613) 737-8957
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

The Ottawa Hospital, General Campus
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Canada
Phone: (613) 737-8899 Ext. 73666
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C.A. Souza Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 20 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Souza ( CPSO# 85559 )

Business Address:
31 Linden Terrace
Ottawa ON  K1S 1Z1
Phone Number: (613) 233-6027

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Almonte General Hospital Almonte
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Renfrew Victoria Hospital Renfrew
St Francis Memorial Hospital Barrys Bay
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Aug 2006 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Aug 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 27 May 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 29 Aug 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 03 May 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 29 Aug 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 03 May 2013

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 03 May 2013 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Carolina Althoff Souza may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  setting  that  is  approved  by  the  Chair,  Department  of
                        Radiology,  University  of  Ottawa,  in  which  Dr.  Souza holds an
                        academic appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of her appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr.  Souza  no
                  longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.