Sparrow, Andrew Keith (CPSO#: 88633)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN - Toronto Western Hospital
Department of Family Medicine
2nd Floor, West Wing
399 Bathurst St
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5888
Fax: (416) 603-5821
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. R. Keith Sparrow Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 24 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Sparrow ( CPSO# 28346 )
Dr. A. Sparrow ( CPSO# 88633 )

Business Address:
Stratford General Hospital
46 General Hospital Drive
Stratford ON  N5A 2Y6
Phone Number: (519) 271-8210


Corporation Name: Dr. Andrew Sparrow Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 26 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Sparrow ( CPSO# 88633 )

Business Address:
UHN - Toronto Western Hospital
Department of Family Medicine
2nd Floor, West Wing
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5888

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREW KEITH SPARROW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SPARROW is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2010