Spencer, John Alan (CPSO#: 27584)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jul 1975

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 31 Dec 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
385 The West Mall
Etobicoke ON  M9C 1E7
Phone: (416) 622-1864
Fax: (416) 622-1215
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. John A. Spencer Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 16 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Spencer ( CPSO# 27584 )

Business Address:
385 The West Mall
Toronto ON  M9C 1E7
Phone Number: (416) 622-1864

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 17 Nov 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1974
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1975
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 1975
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 31 Dec 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 31 Dec 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 31 Dec 2017 Active View Details [+]
            As from December 31, 2017, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. John Alan Spencer, in
            accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Spencer to the College
            of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                              UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
                                                ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                       of
                  
                                          DR. JOHN ALAN SPENCER
                                                ("Dr. Spencer")
                  
                                                       to
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                                (the "College")
                  
                  
                                                                                     

            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "Discipline Committee" means the Discipline Committee of the College;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Spencer, certificate of registration number 27584, am a member of
                  the College.  

            (3)   I, Dr. Spencer, acknowledge that the College investigated a public
                  complaint from a patient related to my ophthalmology practice, bearing
                  File Number 105253.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (4)   I, Dr. Spencer, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
                  effective December 31, 2017 ("Effective Date").

            (5)   Practice Restrictions

                  (a)   I, Dr. Spencer, undertake that I will not engage in intra-ocular
                        ophthalmological surgery and will restrict my practice to
                        office-based ophthalmology.
                  
            (6)   Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Spencer, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location where I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any
                        jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location(s)"), within five
                        (5) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I further
                        undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice
                        Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at that
                        location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Spencer, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere
                        with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations and patient
                        charts by a College representative for the purposes of monitoring
                        my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Spencer, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                        appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person who or institution
                        that may have relevant information, in order for the College to
                        monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Spencer, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent
                        form, attached hereto as Appendix "A".
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (7)   I, Dr. Spencer, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred
                  to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (8)   I, Dr. Spencer, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
                  responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
                  arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
                  Undertaking. 

            (9)   I, Dr. Spencer, acknowledge that I have read and understand the
                  provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal
                  counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my
                  right to do so.

            (10)  I, Dr. Spencer, acknowledge that the College will provide this
                  Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar
                  responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff").

            (11)  I, Dr. Spencer, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee.

            (12)  I, Dr. Spencer, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (13)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Spencer, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Spencer, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (13)(a) above, the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              The College investigated a complaint from a patient related
                              to Dr. Spencer's ophthalmology practice. As a result of the
                              investigation, Dr. Spencer agreed not to engage in
                              intra-ocular ophthalmological surgery and to restrict his
                              practise to office-based ophthalmology.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (14)  I, Dr. Spencer, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all
                  Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has that led to the
                  circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information
                  arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: December 31, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. John Alan Spencer to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective December 31, 2017:

The College investigated a complaint from a patient related to Dr. Spencer’s ophthalmology practice. As a result of the investigation, Dr. Spencer agreed not to engage in intra-ocular ophthalmological surgery and to restrict his practise to office-based ophthalmology.