Spencer Netto, Fernando Antonio Campelo (CPSO#: 83862)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Portuguese

Education:Universidade Federal De Pernambuco, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Fernando Spencer Netto Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 9 2013

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 25 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Dec 2005 to 23 Jan 2006
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 24 Jan 2006 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 02 Jan 2008
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 03 Jan 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
International Specialist Physician - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jan 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Feb 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jul 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 2009
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2013