Spenser, Helen Ruth (CPSO#: 59886)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Jul 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 200
311 McArthur Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1L 8M3
Phone: (613) 738-6990 Ext. 239
Fax: (613) 738-4891
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Helen R Spenser Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 18 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Spenser ( CPSO# 59886 )

Business Address:
Suite 200
311 McArthur Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1L 8M3
Phone Number: (613) 738-6990

Business Address:
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: (613) 737-7600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 1991 CFPC Specialist
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HELEN RUTH SPENSER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SPENSER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1990