Spicer, Lucas (CPSO#: 100213)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Apr 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Brantford General Hospital
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9
Phone: (519) 751-5544
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: L. Spicer Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 19 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Spicer ( CPSO# 100213)

Business Address:
Brantford General Hospital
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9

Business Address:
222 Fairview Drive
Brantford ON  N3R 2X1
Phone Number: (519) 756-8340

Business Address:
238 Grand River Street North
Paris ON  N3L 2M2
Phone Number: (519) 442-2251

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
Brant Community Healthcare System,Willett Site Paris

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LUCAS SPICER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SPICER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Apr 2016