Springer, Colvin Douglas (CPSO#: 52315)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Jul 1980

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Sep 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of the West Indies, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Windsor Regional Cancer Centre
2220 Kildare Road
Windsor ON  N8W 2X3
Phone: (519) 253-5253 Ext. 58590
Fax: (519) 255-8679
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Colvin Springer Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 15 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Springer ( CPSO# 52315 )

Business Address:
Cancer Care Ontario
Windsor Regional Cancer Centre
2220 Kildare Road
Windsor ON  N8W 2X3
Phone Number: (519) 253-5253

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 04 Dec 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. COLVIN DOUGLAS SPRINGER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SPRINGER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Sep 1985