Springer, Jonathon Esy (CPSO#: 68173)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jul 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 513
2425 Bloor Street West
Toronto ON  M6S 4W4
Phone: (416) 766-4587
Fax: (416) 766-5076
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 200
4610 Highway 7
Vaughan ON  L4L 4Y7
Canada
Phone: (905) 856-2626
Fax: (905) 856-2602
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. J. Springer Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 09 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Springer ( CPSO# 68173 )

Business Address:
513 - 2425 Bloor Street West
Toronto ON  M6S 4W4
Phone Number: (416) 766-4587

Business Address:
225 - 4600 Highway #7
Vaughan ON  L4L 4Y7
Phone Number: (416) 650-0017

Business Address:
4610 Highway #7
Vaughan ON  L4L 4Y7
Phone Number: (905) 856-2626

Business Address:
GI Unit
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6156

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 28 Sep 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JONATHON ESY SPRINGER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SPRINGER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 1998