Springle, Milan Anthony (CPSO#: 23260)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Nov 1970

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Nov 1970

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Trafalgar Medical Clinic
1235 Trafalgar Road
Suite 200
Oakville ON  L6H 3P1
Phone: (905) 844-3281
Fax: (905) 849-1076
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M.A. Springle Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 19 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Springle ( CPSO# 23260 )

Business Address:
Trafalgar Medical Clinic
Suite 200
1235 Trafalgar Road
Oakville ON  L6H 3P1
Phone Number: (905) 844-3281

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MILAN ANTHONY SPRINGLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SPRINGLE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Nov 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 15 Oct 1973
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Nov 1977