Srebrnjak, Margaret Jean (CPSO#: 65541)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-2200
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Margaret Srebrnjak Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 15 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Srebrnjak ( CPSO# 65541 )

Business Address:
Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-4171

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 31 Jul 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARGARET JEAN SREBRNJAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SREBRNJAK is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 31 Jul 1996
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 31 Jul 1997
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1993