Sridhar, Srilata Kavita (CPSO#: 82640)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 May 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 May 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lakeridge Health - Oshawa
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone: (905) 576-8711
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

47 Liberty Street South
Bowmanville ON  L1C 2N4
Canada
Phone: (905) 623-3331
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S.K. Sridhar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 12 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Sridhar ( CPSO# 82640 )

Business Address:
Lakeridge Health
47 Liberty Street South
Bowmanville ON  L1C 2N4
Phone Number: (905) 623-3331

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Clarington Site Bowmanville
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 27 Sep 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SRILATA KAVITA SRIDHAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SRIDHAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 May 2010