Srigley, John Robert (CPSO#: 31426)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jun 1977

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Apr 1980

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Program of Laboratory Medicine
Trillium Health Partners
Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-4085
Fax: (905) 813-4132
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Gamma Dynacare Medical Lab
115 Midair Court
Brampton ON  L6T 5M3
Canada
Phone: (905) 790-3000
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

116 Perry Crescent
Etobicoke ON  M9A 1K6
Canada
Phone: (416) 209-4320
Fax: (416) 231-6464
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. John Srigley Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 02 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Srigley ( CPSO# 31426 )

Business Address:
Department of Laboratory Medicine
The Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-4085

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Texas

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 03 Dec 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN ROBERT SRIGLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SRIGLEY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Apr 1980