Srinivasan, Vasundhara (CPSO#: 42486)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1977

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Oct 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Kannada, Telugu

Education:Mysore University, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
4283 Village Center Court
Mississauga, ON L4Z 1S2
Mississauga ON  L4Z 1S2
Phone: (416) 560-1949
Fax: (905) 625-9866
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Probation Services
155 Clark Boulevard unit15
Brampton ON  L6T 4G6
Canada
Phone: (416) 560-1949
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Probation Services
Unit 9
100 East Mall
Etobicoke ON  M8Z 5X2
Canada
Phone: 416-560-1949
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Vasu Srinivasan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 03 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Srinivasan ( CPSO# 42486 )

Business Address:
155 Clarke Boulevard
Brampton ON  L6T 4G6
Phone Number: (416) 560-1949

Business Address:
2301 Haines Road
Mississauga ON  L4Y 1Y1
Phone Number: (905) 625-9866

Business Address:
4283 Village Centre Court
Mississauga ON  L4Z 1S2
Phone Number: (416) 560-1949

Business Address:
Unit 9
100 East Mall
Etobicoke ON  M8Z 5X2
Phone Number: (416) 560-1949

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 08 Jun 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VASUNDHARA SRINIVASAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SRINIVASAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Oct 1985