Starok, Carina Ninette (CPSO#: 58218)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Mar 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 202
460 Springbank Drive
London ON  N6J 0A8
Phone: (519) 672-0060
Fax: (519) 661-0597
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Carina Starok Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 31 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Starok ( CPSO# 58218 )

Business Address:
Suite 202
460 Springbank Drive
London ON  N6J 0A8
Phone Number: (519) 672-0060

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Aug 1989 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CARINA NINETTE STAROK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STAROK is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1987 to 13 Jun 1988
Other - Rotating Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Mar 1989