Staroselsky, Arthur (CPSO#: 85730)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Oct 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Sep 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew, Russian, Ukrainian

Education:Doneck Medical University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 210
31 Disera Drive
Thornhill ON  L4J 0A7
Phone: (905) 771-7755
Fax: (905) 771-7752
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Staroselsky Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 20 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Staroselsky ( CPSO# 85730 )

Business Address:
Suite 210
31 Disera Drive
Thornhill ON  L4J 0A7
Phone Number: (905) 771-7755

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 31 Aug 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ARTHUR STAROSELSKY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STAROSELSKY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 30 Oct 2006 to 21 Jan 2007
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Clinical Pharmacology

University of Toronto, 22 Jan 2007 to 03 Sep 2007
Clinical Fellow - Clinical Pharmacology

University of Toronto, 04 Sep 2007 to 23 Dec 2007
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 24 Dec 2007 to 03 Sep 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 04 Sep 2008 to 03 Sep 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Clinical Pharmacology and Toxicology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Clinical Pharmacology and Toxicology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 30 Oct 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Jan 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 04 Sep 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Dec 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Sep 2009