State, Jonathon Phillip (CPSO#: 68171)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Mar 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Mar 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Windsor Essex CHC
Sandwich Community Health
3320 College Avenue
Windsor ON  N9C 0E1
Phone: (519) 258-6002
Fax: (519) 258-7896
Electoral District: 01
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Windsor Essex CHC
711 Pelissier Street
Windsor ON  N9A 4L4
Canada
Phone: (519) 997-2824
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Michigan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Jun 1996 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JONATHON PHILLIP STATE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STATE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Mar 2008