Stechison, Michael Thomas (CPSO#: 33647)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1981

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Aug 1982

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
743 Old Norcross Rd
Lawrenceville GA  30046
United States
Phone: 404-683-5240
Fax: 404-953-7400
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

3855 Pleasant Hill Rd
Suite 270
Duluth GA  30096
United States
Phone: 404-683-5240
Fax: 404-953-7400
County: 
Electoral District: 

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Georgia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 06 Dec 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL THOMAS STECHISON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STECHISON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1981 to 15 Jun 1982
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
Research Fellows - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Research Fellows - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Research Fellows - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 4 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 4 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 5 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 31 Dec 1988
Resident 5 - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 1982