Steciuk, Paige Elizabeth (CPSO#: 65155)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: Neill, Paige Elizabeth (used until: 06 Jun 1993 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 305
190 Cundles Road East
Barrie ON  L4M 4S5
Phone: (705) 726-2060
Fax: (705) 726-4826
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Paige E. Steciuk Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 12 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Steciuk ( CPSO# 65155 )

Business Address:
305 - 190 Cundles Road East
Barrie ON  L4M 4S5
Phone Number: (705) 726-2060

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1994 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAIGE ELIZABETH STECIUK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STECIUK is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1992 to 14 Jun 1993
Other - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1993