Steel, Andrew Christopher (CPSO#: 85868)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Apr 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Apr 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Department of Anaesthesiology
Room 11PMB 121
585 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2N2
Phone: (416) 340-4746
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Andrew Christopher Steel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 09 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Steel ( CPSO# 85868 )

Business Address:
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Department of Anaesthesiology
Room 11PMB121
585 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2N2
Phone Number: (416) 340-4746

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health,Queen Street Site Toronto
Kensington Eye Institute Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 08 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREW CHRISTOPHER STEEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STEEL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2007 to 23 Mar 2007
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 24 Mar 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 May 2009
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 04 Jan 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Mar 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 May 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 20 Apr 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Apr 2014