Stein, Neal Phillip (CPSO#: 32964)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Nov 1981

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Nov 1981

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: N. P. Stein Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 25 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Stein ( CPSO# 32964 )

Business Address:
No business address available

Medical Records Location

Address: Docudavit Solutions Inc 28 Eugene Street Toronto ON M6B 3Z4 Tel: 1-888-781-9083
Date Received: 09 Aug 2017

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1982 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NEAL PHILLIP STEIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STEIN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Nov 1981