Stein, Richard Andrew Michael (CPSO#: 79179)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 406
89 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 2V2
Phone: (905) 268-9928
Fax: (888) 972-4226
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Richard Stein Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 24 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Stein ( CPSO# 79179 )

Business Address:
Queensway Obstetrics and Gynecology
89 Queensway West
Suite 406
Mississauga ON  L5B 2V2
Phone Number: (905) 268-9928

Business Address:
Trillium Health Partners - Mississauga Hospital
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone Number: (905) 848-7100

Business Address:
Trillium Health Partners - Queensway Health Centre
150 Sherway Drive
Toronto ON  M9C 1A5
Phone Number: (905) 848-7100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RICHARD ANDREW MICHAEL STEIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STEIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2008