Steinnagel, Brenda Lee (CPSO#: 66608)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Oct 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Student Wellness Center
McMaster University
1280 Main St West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4L8
Phone: (905) 525-9140 Ext. 27700
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Brenda Steinnagel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 08 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Steinnagel ( CPSO# 66608 )

Business Address:
50 Dundurn Street South
Hamilton ON  L8P 4W3
Phone Number: (905) 529-4040

Business Address:
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4S4
Phone Number: (905) 525-9140

Business Address:
67 Kenilworth Avenue North
Hamilton ON  L8H 4R6

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist
FCFP - Family Medicine Effective: 17 Oct 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRENDA LEE STEINNAGEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STEINNAGEL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 31 Dec 1995
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Oct 1995