Stephen, Wesley John (CPSO#: 62831)

Current Status: Active Member as of 31 Oct 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Oct 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Wesley J. Stephen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 11 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Stephen ( CPSO# 62831 )

Business Address:
1433 Ontario Street
Burlington ON  L7S 1G5
Phone Number: (905) 681-4812

Business Address:
1230 North Shore Boulevard
Burlington ON  L7S 1W7
Phone Number: (905) 632-3737

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 26 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WESLEY JOHN STEPHEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STEPHEN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1990
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 Jun 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Oct 2001