Stephenson, Megan Alexandra (CPSO#: 71196)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Dec 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 102
348 Muskoka Road # 3 North
Huntsville ON  P1H 1H8
Phone: 705-789-4377
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Megan Stephenson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 15 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Stephenson ( CPSO# 71196 )

Business Address:
Suite 102
348 Muskoka Road 3 North
Huntsville ON  P1H 1H8
Phone Number: (705) 789-4377

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare,Huntsville District Memorial Hospital Huntsville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Dec 1999 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MEGAN ALEXANDRA STEPHENSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STEPHENSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 31 Dec 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Dec 1999