Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Stevens, David George (CPSO#: 64036)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Nov 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 115
675 Queen Street South
Kitchener ON  N2M 1A1
Phone: (519) 603-0623
Fax: (519) 603-0625
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David G. Stevens Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 02 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Stevens ( CPSO# 64036 )

Business Address:
Suite 115
675 Queen Street South
Kitchener ON  N2M 1A1
Phone Number: (519) 603-0623

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
McMaster Children's Hospital,Division of Pediatric Critical Care Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 11 Sep 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID GEORGE STEVENS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STEVENS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Nov 1992