Stewart, Andrew Edwin Fletcher (CPSO#: 81136)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit L4
30 Dupont Street East
Waterloo ON  N2J 2G9
Phone: (519) 746-7878
Fax: (519) 746-7877
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Andrew Stewart Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 25 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Stewart ( CPSO# 81136 )

Business Address:
L4 - 30 Dupont Street East
Waterloo ON  N2J 2G9
Phone Number: (519) 746-7878

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREW EDWIN FLETCHER STEWART may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STEWART is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 28 Feb 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Jul 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 31 Mar 2008 to 20 Apr 2008
Elective Trainee - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 21 Apr 2008 to 18 May 2008
Elective Trainee - Maternal-Fetal Medicine

University of Toronto, 19 May 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
Elective Trainee - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 02 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Mar 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009