Stewart, Christine Elizabeth (CPSO#: 57104)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Nov 1987


Former Name: Robb, Christine Elizabeth (used until: 31 Jul 1986 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
RVH-Rotary Place-FMTU
201 Georgian Dr
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone: (705) 792-3333
Fax: (705) 728-4120
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: CE Stewart Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 03 2012

Dr. C. Stewart ( CPSO# 57104 )

Business Address:
Royal Victoria Hospital
Rotary Place FMTU
201 Georgian Drive
3rd Floor
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone Number: (705) 792-3315

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie


Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1988 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. CHRISTINE ELIZABETH STEWART may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STEWART is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Nov 1987