Steyn, Andrea Melissa Prima (CPSO#: 83420)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Jul 2008

Summary

Former Name: Procter, Andrea Melissa Prima (used until: 08 Jul 2015 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Cambridge Memorial Hospital
700 Coronation Blvd
Cambridge ON  N1R 3G2
Phone: (519) 621-2330
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Guelph General Hospital
115 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 4J4
Canada
Phone: (519) 822-5350
County: County of Wellington
Electoral District: 03

Rouge Valley Centenary Hospital
2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 4B9
Canada
Phone: (416) 284-8131
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Steyn Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 19 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Steyn ( CPSO# 83890 )
Dr. A. Steyn ( CPSO# 83420 )

Business Address:
Timmins and District Hospital
700 Ross Avenue East
Timmins ON  P4N 8P2
Phone Number: (705) 267-2131

Business Address:
Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
115 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 4J4

Business Address:
700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 3G2

Business Address:
MSK Centre
115 - 675 Queen Street South
Kitchener ON  N2M 1A1
Phone Number: (519) 603-0662

Business Address:
Grand River Hospital
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone Number: (519) 603-0662

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 31 Jul 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREA MELISSA PRIMA STEYN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STEYN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Jul 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 2008