Stoffman, John Morris (CPSO#: 22047)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 1969

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1969

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John M. Stoffman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 01 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Stoffman ( CPSO# 22047 )

Business Address:
No business address available

Medical Records Location

Address: Command Services Record Management Ltd. 100 Piccadilly Street London ON N6A 1R8 Tel: (519) 672-1460
Date Received: 08 Sep 2017

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 01 Jan 1973 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN MORRIS STOFFMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STOFFMAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1969