Strafella, Antonio Paolo (CPSO#: 69587)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Nov 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Academic Practice as of 15 Nov 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Italian

Education:University of Bologna, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto Western Hospital
Division of Neurology MCL7 402
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5706
Fax: (416) 603-5004
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Antonio Strafella Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 20 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Strafella ( CPSO# 69587 )

Business Address:
UHN Toronto Western Hospital
Division of Neurology MCL7-402
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5706

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Italy

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre of Addiction & Mental Health,- College Street Site Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 02 Oct 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANTONIO PAOLO STRAFELLA may practise medicine only in a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the DEPARTMENT OF MEDICINE, DIVISION OF NEUROLOGY, UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO in which Dr. STRAFELLA holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment at the rank of full or associate professor;

(2) Dr. STRAFELLA may practise medicine only to the extent required by the teaching or research requirements of the appointment referred to in clause (1);

(3) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:

(i) When Dr. STRAFELLA no longer holds certification by the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada or the College of Family Physicians of Canada,

(ii) When Dr. STRAFELLA no longer holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment to the academic staff of an accredited medical school in Ontario at the rank of full or associate professor,

(iii) When Dr. STRAFELLA no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

NOTE: The expiry date of this certificate is as explained above.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 31 Mar 1996
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Apr 1996 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Aug 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 22 Aug 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Nov 2007