Strang, Barbara Kathleen (CPSO#: 63704)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Nov 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Juravinski Cancer Centre
699 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 5C2
Phone: (905) 387-9495 Ext. 63123
Fax: (905) 575-6326
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Joseph Brant Hospital
1230 Northshore Boulevard East
Burlington ON  L7S 1W7
Canada
Phone: (905) 336-4103
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Barbara Strang Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 07 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Strang ( CPSO# 63704 )

Business Address:
Juravinski Cancer Centre
699 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 5C2
Phone Number: (905) 387-9495

Business Address:
1230 North Shore Boulevard
Burlington ON  L7S 1W7
Phone Number: (905) 632-3730

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BARBARA KATHLEEN STRANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STRANG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Nov 1992