Strauss, Barry Irwin (CPSO#: 65556)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 1993


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
10 Unionville Gate
Suite 301
Markham ON  L3R 0W7
Phone: (905) 475-3121
Fax: (905) 475-4270
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

4300 hwy 7
Markham ON  L3R0W7
Phone: 9054772822
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: B Strauss Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 30 2006

Dr. B. Strauss ( CPSO# 65556 )
Dr. M. Hussman ( CPSO# 59684 )

Business Address:
235 Danforth Avenue
Suite 402
Toronto ON  M4K 1N2
Phone Number: (416) 466-4290

Business Address:
301 - 10 Unionville Gate
Markham ON  L3R 0W7
Phone Number: (905) 475-3121

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham


Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1994 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. BARRY IRWIN STRAUSS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STRAUSS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1992 to 14 Jun 1993
Other - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1993