Strban, Martin (CPSO#: 58580)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Aug 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Slovak

Education:Queen's University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 308
18 Pine Street
Kitchener ON  N2H 5Z8
Phone: (519) 745-3505
Fax: (519) 745-7975
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Martin Strban Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 19 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Strban ( CPSO# 58580 )

Business Address:
18 Pine Street
Unit 308
Kitchener ON  N2H 5Z8
Phone Number: (519) 745-3505

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
Louise Marshall Hospital,North Wellington Health Care Mount Forest
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener
Woodstock General Hospital Woodstock

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 24 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARTIN STRBAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STRBAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 May 1989 to 30 Jun 1989
Elective Trainee - Critical Care Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Respiratory Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 5 - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 1989