Stronks, John Edward (CPSO#: 58125)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jul 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit B
372 Lacroix Street
Chatham ON  N7M 2W3
Phone: (519) 355-1515
Fax: (519) 355-1192
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. John Stronks Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 27 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Stronks ( CPSO# 58125 )

Business Address:
372-B Lacroix Street
Chatham ON  N7M 2W3
Phone Number: (519) 355-1463

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Chatham Public General Hospital Society Chatham
St Joseph's Health Services,Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Aug 1989 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN EDWARD STRONKS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STRONKS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1988