Struk, Daniel William (CPSO#: 67834)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 May 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 May 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Health Sciences North
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone: (705) 522-2200 Ext. 4745
Fax: (705) 523-7017
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Daniel Struk Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 05 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Struk ( CPSO# 67834 )

Business Address:
421 Shepherdson Road
New Liskeard ON  P0J 1P0
Phone Number: (705) 647-8121

Business Address:
Sudbury Regional Hospital
Laurentian Site
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 522-2200

Business Address:
70 Spine Road
Elliot Lake ON  P5A 1X2

Business Address:
825 McKinnon Drive
Espanola ON  P5E 1R4

Business Address:
525 Causley Street
Blind River ON  P0R 1B0

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Espanola General Hospital Espanola
Health Sciences North Sudbury
Manitoulin Health Centre Little Current
Manitoulin Health Centre,Mindemoya Site Mindemoya
North Shore Health Network Blind River
St Joseph's General Hospital,Elliot Lake Elliot Lake
Temiskaming Hospital New Liskeard
West Parry Sound Health Centre Parry Sound

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DANIEL WILLIAM STRUK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STRUK is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 May 2000