Struthers, Emma Truus (CPSO#: 99986)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Dalhousie University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 200
10 South Front Street
Belleville ON  K8N 2Y3
Phone: (613) 779-9910
Fax: (613) 779-9689
Electoral District: 06
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Belleville General Hospital
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9
Canada
Phone: (613) 969-7400 Ext. 31
County: County of Hastings
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Emma Struthers Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 10 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Struthers ( CPSO# 99986 )

Business Address:
200 - 10 South Front Street
Belleville ON  K8N 2Y3
Phone Number: (613) 779-9910

Business Address:
Belleville General Hospital
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9
Phone Number: (613) 969-7400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Quinte Health Care,Trenton Memorial Trenton
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EMMA TRUUS STRUTHERS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STRUTHERS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Apr 2013 to 21 Apr 2013
Elective Trainee - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 22 Apr 2013 to 12 May 2013
Elective Trainee - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 13 May 2013 to 31 May 2013
Elective Trainee - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jun 2013 to 21 Jun 2013
Elective Trainee - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 20 Nov 2013 to 24 Nov 2013
Elective Trainee - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Nov 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Nov 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014