Struzik, Lukasz (CPSO#: 84708)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jul 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:University of Toronto, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 1
40 Innovation Drive
Vaughan ON  L4H 0T2
Phone: (905) 851-2444 Ext. 2
Fax: (905) 851-2412
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

3900 Rutherford Road
Woodbridge ON  L4H 3G8
Canada
Phone: (905) 417-5461
Fax: (416) 417-5463
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. L. Struzik Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 03 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Struzik ( CPSO# 84708 )

Business Address:
1 - 40 Innovation Drive
Vaughan ON  L4H 0T2
Phone Number: (905) 851-2444

Business Address:
3900 Rutherford Road
Woodbridge ON  L4H 3G8
Phone Number: (905) 417-5461

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LUKASZ STRUZIK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STRUZIK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008