Sturm, Harold (CPSO#: 31295)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jun 1978

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 03 Jan 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:University of Toronto, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 202
441 Clark Avenue West
Thornhill ON  L4J 6W8
Phone: (905) 764-5114
Fax: 9057649615
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 202
1920 Weston Road
Weston ON  M9N 1W2
Canada
Phone: (416) 245-8583
Fax: (905) 764-9615
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Harold Sturm Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 16 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Sturm ( CPSO# 31295 )

Business Address:
Suite 202
441 Clark Avenue West
Thornhill ON  L4J 6W8
Phone Number: (905) 764-5114

Business Address:
Suite 202
1920 Weston Road
Weston ON  M9N 1W4
Phone Number: (416) 245-8583

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 13 Jun 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jan 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Mar 1984
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Jan 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 03 Jan 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 03 Jan 2017 Active View Details [+]
            As from January 3, 2017, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Harold Sturm, in
            accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Sturm to the College of
            Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:


                               UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                            ("Undertaking")

                                                  of

                                           DR. HAROLD STURM
                                             ("Dr. Sturm")

                                                  to 

                             COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                            (the "College")



            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
                  the College;
                  
                  "NMS" means the Drug Program Services Branch, the Narcotics Monitoring
                  System implemented under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010;

                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Sturm, certificate of registration number 31295, am a member of
                  the College.  The College has received information regarding my standard
                  of practice.

            (3)   I, Dr. Sturm, acknowledge that the College initiated an investigation
                  bearing File Number 102036 (the "Investigation") into whether I engaged
                  in professional misconduct regarding the preparation of consultation
                  reports and my conduct with the parent of a patient. 

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (4)   I, Dr. Sturm undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
                  effective immediately.

            (5)   Clinical Supervision 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Sturm, undertake to practise under the guidance of a
                        clinical supervisor(s) acceptable to the College (the "Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)"), for six (6) months ("Clinical Supervision"). 
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Sturm acknowledge that I have reviewed the Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)'s undertaking, attached hereto as Schedule "A", and
                        understand what is required of the Clinical Supervisor(s). The
                        Clinical Supervisor(s) will, at minimum: 
                  
                        (i)   Facilitate the education program set out in the
                              Individualized Education Plan ("IEP") attached as Schedule
                              "B";
                  
                        (ii)  Meet with me at my Practice Location on two occasions;
                  
                              i.    At the first meeting, the Clinical Supervisor will
                                    review no less than five (5) of my consult notes and
                                    reports for patients with behavioural/developmental
                                    disorder, and provide feedback.  
                  
                              ii.   At the second meeting, six months later, the Clinical
                                    Supervisor shall review and provide feedback on consult
                                    reports prepared in the intervening six months and
                                    allow me to reflect on changes I have made to his
                                    practice.  
                  
                        (iii) Discuss any concerns arising from the chart reviews;
                  
                        (iv)  Make recommendations to me for practice improvements and
                              ongoing professional development and inquire into my
                              compliance with the recommendations; 
                  
                        (v)   Perform any other duties, such as reviewing other documents
                              or conducting interviews with staff or colleagues, that the
                              Clinical Supervisor(s) deem necessary to my Clinical
                              Supervision; and
                  
                        (vi)  Submit written reports to the College at the conclusion of
                              the supervision, or more frequently if the Clinical
                              Supervisor(s) has concerns about my standard of practice.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Sturm, acknowledge that the charts reviewed shall be
                        selected by the Clinical Supervisor(s) based on the educational
                        needs identified in the IEP set out at Schedule "B" to my
                        Undertaking and concerns that may arise during the period of
                        Clinical Supervision.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Sturm, undertake to cooperate fully with the Clinical
                        Supervision of my practice, conducted under the term of this
                        Undertaking and Schedule "A" attached, and to abide by the
                        recommendations of my Clinical Supervisor(s), including but not
                        limited to, any recommended practice improvements and ongoing
                        professional development.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Sturm, undertake to ensure that Schedule "A" to this
                        Undertaking, is signed and delivered to the College within thirty
                        (30) days of the date I execute this Undertaking.
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Sturm, undertake that if a person who has given an
                        undertaking in Schedule "A" to this Undertaking is unable or
                        unwilling to continue to fulfill its provisions, I shall, within
                        twenty (20) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed
                        undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who
                        is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the
                        College within that time.
                  
                  (g)   I, Dr. Sturm, agree that if I am unable to obtain a Clinical
                        Supervisor on the provisions set out under sections (5)(e) and/or
                        (f) above, I will cease practising medicine until such time as I
                        have obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.  
                  
                  (h)   I, Dr. Sturm, agree that if I am required to cease practise as a
                        result of section (5)(g) above this will constitute a term,
                        condition or limitation on my certificate of registration and that
                        term, condition or limitation will be included on the public
                        register.
                  
            (6)   Professional Education  

                  (a)   I, Dr. Sturm, undertake to participate in and successfully complete
                        all aspects of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as Schedule "B",
                        including all of the following professional education (the
                        "Professional Education"):
                  
                  
                        (i)   individualized instruction in communication satisfactory to
                              the College, with an instructor selected by the College; and
                  
                        (ii)  any additional professional education recommended by my
                              Clinical Supervisor(s).
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Sturm, undertake to provide proof to the College of my
                        successful completion of the Professional Education, including
                        proof of registration and attendance and participant assessment
                        reports, within one (1) month of completing it. I acknowledge that
                        the College will determine, in its sole discretion, whether I have
                        successfully completed the Professional Education.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Sturm, acknowledge that a report or reports may be provided
                        to the College regarding my progress and compliance with the
                        Professional Education.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Sturm, undertake to complete this requirement by August 1,
                        2017 or, if no satisfactory program is available by that time, by
                        the first possible opportunity thereafter.
                  
            (7)   Reassessment of Practice

                  (a)   I, Dr. Sturm, undertake that, approximately six (6) months after
                        the completion of the Clinical Supervision and Professional
                        Education set out in section (3) above and Schedule "A" attached, I
                        will submit to a Reassessment of my practice ("the Reassessment")
                        by an assessor or assessors selected by the College (the
                        "Assessor(s)").  I acknowledge and agree that the Reassessment may
                        include a chart review, direct observation of my care, interviews
                        with colleagues and co-workers, feedback from patients and any
                        other tools deemed necessary by the College.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Sturm, undertake to co-operate fully with the Reassessment,
                        conducted under the term of this Undertaking 
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Sturm, acknowledge and agree that my Clinical Supervisor(s)
                        may receive and review the findings of the Assessor(s), and may
                        discuss with the Assessor(s) any issues or concerns arising from
                        the Reassessment.  I also acknowledge that the results of the
                        Reassessment will be provided to me and reported to the College and
                        the report may form the basis of further action by the College. 
                  
            (8)   Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Sturm, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location that I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any
                        jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location(s)"), within five
                        (5) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I further
                        undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice
                        Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at that
                        location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Sturm, undertake and agree that I will submit to, and not
                        interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Location(s)
                        and patient records by a College representative for the purposes of
                        monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Sturm, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                        appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person who or institution
                        that may have relevant information, in order for the College to
                        monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Sturm, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent
                        form(s), attached hereto as Schedule "C". 
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (9)   I, Dr. Sturm, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to
                  in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (10)  I, Dr. Sturm, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
                  responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
                  arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
                  Undertaking. 

            (11)  I, Dr. Sturm, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions
                  of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in
                  reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do
                  so.

            (12)  I, Dr. Sturm, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking
                  to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at
                  any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff").

            (13)  I, Dr. Sturm, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee of the College.

            (14)  I, Dr. Sturm, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (15)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Sturm, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Sturm, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (15)(a) above, the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              Dr. Sturm was the subject of a College investigation into
                              whether he engaged in professional misconduct regarding the
                              preparation of consultation reports and in his communication
                              with the parent of a patient. As a result of the
                              investigation:
                  
                              *     Dr. Sturm will practise under the guidance of a
                                    Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for 6
                                    months. 
                              *     Dr. Sturm will engage in professional education in
                                    communications.
                              *     Dr. Sturm's practice will be reassessed by an assessor
                                    selected by the College within 6 months of the
                                    completion of the Professional Education and Clinical
                                    Supervision.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (16)  I, Dr. Sturm, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
                  following information to any person who requires this information for the
                  purposes of facilitating my completion of the professional education set
                  out in section (6) above and to all Clinical Supervisors, and/or
                  Assessors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (17)  I, Dr. Sturm, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all
                  Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has that led to the
                  circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information
                  arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

            (18)  I, Dr. Sturm, give my irrevocable consent to any person who facilitates
                  my completion of the professional education set out in section (6) above,
                  and to all Clinical Supervisors, Chiefs of Staff and Assessors, to
                  disclose to the College, and to one another, any information:

                  (a)   relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   relevant to the provisions of the Clinical Supervisor's undertaking
                        set out at Schedule "A";
                  
                  (c)   relevant to the Reassessment;
                  
                  (d)   relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this
                        Undertaking; and/or  
                  
                  (e)   which comes to his or her attention in the course of providing the
                        professional education set out in section (6) above and which he or
                        she reasonably believes indicates a potential risk of harm to my
                        patients.

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: January 3, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Harold Sturm to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective January 3, 2017:

Dr. Sturm was the subject of a College investigation into whether he engaged in professional misconduct regarding the preparation of consultation reports and in his communication with the parent of a patient. As a result of the investigation:

• Dr. Sturm will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for 6 months.
• Dr. Sturm will engage in professional education in communications.
• Dr. Sturm’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within 6 months of the completion of the Professional Education and Clinical Supervision.